OK SB861 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sales tax; providing sales tax exemption for certain event; modifying definitions in Quality Events Incentive Act. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax; providing sales tax exemption for certain event; modifying definitions in Quality Events Incentive Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |