OK SB86 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; specifying apportionment of certain appropriated funds; providing for certain expenditures of federal funding. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; specifying apportionment of certain appropriated funds; providing for certain expenditures of federal funding. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22HouseTo Senate
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-21SenateEmergency added
2019-05-21SenateCCR read
2019-05-21SenateCoauthored by Senator Jech
2019-05-21SenateRemove as author Senator Jech; authored by Senator Simpson
2019-05-21HouseConference granted, HC's named Echols, ODonnell, Taylor, Virgin, Walke
2019-05-21SenateSCs changed Jech to Simpson
2019-05-16SenateSCs named Jech, Shaw, Bice, Paxton, Brooks, Matthews
2019-05-16SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseConsidered
2019-04-24HouseLaid over
2019-04-24HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-25HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-03-04SenateTitle restored
2019-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative Sanders
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Jech
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb86&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB86%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB86%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB86%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB86%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB86%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB86%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB86%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB86%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB86_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB86_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback