OK SB86 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB86
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Vetoed 05/09/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Vetoed 05/09/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Right-of-way acquisition; economic study completion. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Right-of-way acquisition; economic study completion. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendment (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 58) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendment (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 58) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Vetoed 05/09/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted AYES: 31 NAYS: 13 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 27; Ayes: 68 Nays: 19 |
2018-04-25 | House | Emergency added |
2018-04-25 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2018-04-25 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-25 | House | Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2018-04-25 | House | Amended |
2018-04-25 | House | General Order |
2018-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Transportation Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure David |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 19 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by McDugle |
2018-02-28 | Senate | coauthored by Frix |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Faught (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Fry; authored by Senator David |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB86 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Transportation