OK SB858 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB858
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conviction of criminal offenses; prohibiting imprisonment for certain acts. Effective date.
Title
Conviction of criminal offenses; prohibiting imprisonment for certain acts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB858 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019