OK SB858 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-18 - Failed in Committee - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-18 - Failed in Committee - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Charter schools; removing certain restrictions regarding curriculum for blind and deaf students. Effective date.
Title
Charter schools; removing certain restrictions regarding curriculum for blind and deaf students. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Randon Grau [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Education |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 13 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 136 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb858&Session=1400 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/SB/sb858_int.rtf |