OK SB858 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Firearm information; guidelines for certain inquiries regarding firearms; health care practitioner collecting statistical information, patient participation not required. Effective date.
Title
Firearm information; guidelines for certain inquiries regarding firearms; health care practitioner collecting statistical information, patient participation not required. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-10 | First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 4 | |
2011-03-09 | remove as principal author Representative Wesselhoft and substitute with Representative Ritze | |
2011-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Wesselhoft (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Reynolds | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Russell | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1277 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 1 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |