OK SB851 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB851
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Water and water rights; defining term. Effective date.
Title
Water and water rights; defining term. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB851 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Title stricken