OK SB85 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB85
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Right-of-way acquisition; utilities; adding exemption for certain fund match. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Right-of-way acquisition; utilities; adding exemption for certain fund match. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Sen. Jack Fry [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/22/2017 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-27 | House | Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-04-27 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Remove as principal author Representative Sanders and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sanders (principal House author) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB85 (Carry Over) 2017-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2017