OK SB849 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State Election Board; providing for classification and unclassification of certain positions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Election Board; providing for classification and unclassification of certain positions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23; Ayes: 65 Nays: 22
2015-05-22HouseJCR adopted
2015-05-22HouseGeneral Order
2015-05-21HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2015-05-20HouseFirst Reading
2015-05-20SenateEngrossed to House
2015-05-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-05-20SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2015-05-20SenateJCR adopted
2015-05-19SenateReported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2015-05-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2015-05-14Senatecoauthored by Casey
2015-05-14Senatecoauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2015-05-14Senatecoauthored by Treat
2015-05-14SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2015-05-14SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
748405New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback