OK SB848 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Opioid drugs; requiring continuing education courses for certain professions; requiring the Insurance Department to conduct a study; requiring Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control to submit a report. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid drugs; requiring continuing education courses for certain professions; requiring the Insurance Department to conduct a study; requiring Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control to submit a report. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateApproved by Governor 05/21/2019
2019-05-16SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-15HouseTo Senate
2019-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2019-05-15HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
2019-05-15HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-14HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-05-14SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-13SenateCCR read
2019-05-08HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-07SenateSCs named Rader, Smalley, McCortney, Scott, Young, Hicks
2019-05-01SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-25SenateHAs read
2019-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2019-04-24HouseAmended
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseEmergency restored
2019-04-11HouseTitle restored
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-03-12SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-03-12SenateEmergency added
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2019-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Rader
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb848&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB848%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB848%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB848%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB848%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB848%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB848%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB848%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB848%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB848%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB848_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB848_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback