OK SB840 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; proceedings venue; judicial review; employee contributions considered trust funds.
Title
Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; proceedings venue; judicial review; employee contributions considered trust funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-11 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 31; Ayes: 55 Nays: 38 | |
2011-04-11 | General Order | |
2011-03-31 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 1701 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1701 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 904 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 920B | New Code | See Bill Text |