OK SB835 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB835
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Discrimination; prohibiting certain discrimination by public accommodation on basis of vaccination or immunity status. Emergency.
Title
Discrimination; prohibiting certain discrimination by public accommodation on basis of vaccination or immunity status. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kirt |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Merrick |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Remove as principal author Representative Hardin (David) and substitute with Representative West (Josh) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Weaver |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Montgomery |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Newhouse |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stephens |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB835 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Coauthored by Senator Rogers