OK SB821 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB821
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 89-13)
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Coauthored by Senator Quinn
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Coauthored by Senator Quinn
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Patient's Right to Pharmacy Choice Act; modifying certain contract restrictions; modifying monitoring requirements of certain insurers. Effective date.
Title
Patient's Right to Pharmacy Choice Act; modifying certain contract restrictions; modifying monitoring requirements of certain insurers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 21 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 21 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Quinn |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Haste |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vetoed 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 11 |
2021-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak |
2021-04-20 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Dossett (J.A.) |
2021-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Marti, Dempsey, Hilbert, Olsen, Phillips, Johns, Humphrey, Sterling, Fugate, West (Tammy), Kerbs, Vancuren, Gann, Smith, McBride, Hasenbeck, Roe, Dobrinski, Kendrix, Caldwell (Chad), Ranson, Hardin (David), Fetgatter, ODonnell, Virgin, May, Roberts (Dustin), Newton, Lowe (Dick), Talley, Randleman, West (Josh), McCall, Townley, Conley, Burns, Boatman, Cornwell, Bashore, Strom, Miller, Lawson, Luttrell, Culver, Russ, Ford, Sims, McDugle, Walke, Cruz, Wallace, Echols, Nichols, Provenzano, Patzkowsky, Manger, Bush, Worthen, Bennett, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Rosecrants, Williams, Sneed, Caldwell (Trey), Baker |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Daniels |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Coleman |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2021-03-08 | Senate | coauthored by Boles |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2021-03-01 | Senate | coauthored by Pae |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Taylor |
2021-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Grego |
2021-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Frix |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2021-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Moore |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hall |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Weaver |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Daniels |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB821 (Carry Over) 2021-05-25 - Coauthored by Senator Quinn