OK SB820 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain child to enter retail spirits premise under certain conditions. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain child to enter retail spirits premise under certain conditions. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseMotion expired
2019-04-24HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative McEntire
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 49
2019-04-24HouseConsidered
2019-04-22HouseLaid over
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback