OK SB816 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB816
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Residency programs; specifying priority for considerations. Effective date.
Title
Residency programs; specifying priority for considerations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/17/2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB816 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017