OK SB814 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Vetoed 06/04/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Fingerprinting prisoners; requiring arresting agencies take prisoners directly to medical facility or hospital under certain circumstances. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fingerprinting prisoners; requiring arresting agencies take prisoners directly to medical facility or hospital under certain circumstances. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-04SenateVetoed 06/04/2014
2014-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-23HouseTo Senate
2014-05-23HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 25
2014-05-23House2 CCR adopted
2014-05-22House2 CCR submitted
2014-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2014-05-22Senate2 CCR adopted
2014-05-21SenateEmergency removed
2014-05-21SenateEnacting clause restored
2014-05-21SenateTitle restored
2014-05-21Senate2 CCR read
2014-05-16SenateSCs named Crain, Newberry, Holt, David, McAffrey, Shumate
2014-05-16HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services
2014-05-15SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-05-14Senatecoauthored by Enns
2014-05-14Senateremove as principal author Representative Enns and substitute with Representative Biggs
2014-05-07SenateCoauthored by Anderson
2014-05-07SenateRemove as author Senator Anderson; authored by Crain
2013-05-22SenateConferees unable to agree
2013-05-07HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services
2013-05-07SenateSCs named Anderson, Newberry, Branan, Barrington, Garrison, Ellis
2013-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2013-04-16Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2013-04-09SenateHAs read
2013-04-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-04-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-04-08HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1
2013-04-08HouseGeneral Order
2013-03-28HouseEnacting clause stricken
2013-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
2013-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
2013-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2013-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2013-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-03-11SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
2013-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-02-14SenateTitle stricken
2013-02-14SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2013-02-07Senatecoauthored by Enns (principal House author)
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Anderson
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
218421New CodeSee Bill Text
218422New CodeSee Bill Text
218423New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback