OK SB81 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits; modifying time period and condition under which certain credits are allowed. Effective date.
Title
Income tax credits; modifying time period and condition under which certain credits are allowed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |