OK SB805 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Remove Representative Christian as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martin (Steve)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Remove Representative Christian as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martin (Steve)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Armed security guards; modifying scope of firearm authorization; waiver of disqualification. Emergency.
Title
Armed security guards; modifying scope of firearm authorization; waiver of disqualification. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Remove Representative Christian as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martin (Steve) | |
2011-04-06 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Christian (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Shortey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |