OK SB802 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Tobacco products; removing articles of tobacco and products made of tobacco substitutes from certain definitions. Effective date.
Title
Tobacco products; removing articles of tobacco and products made of tobacco substitutes from certain definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 15 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | coauthored by Simpson |
2013-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Finance committee |
2013-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 600 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 10A | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |