OK SB798 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB798
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eyewitness identification procedures; requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt certain policies. Effective date.
Title
Eyewitness identification procedures; requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt certain policies. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB798 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019