OK SB798 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm rights; authorizing certain persons to petition governor for restoration of certain rights. Effective date.
Title
Firearm rights; authorizing certain persons to petition governor for restoration of certain rights. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |