OK SB79 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB79
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; specifying authority to enter cooperative purchasing agreements. Effective date.
Title
Public buildings and public works; specifying authority to enter cooperative purchasing agreements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB79 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee