OK SB787 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Pharmacy Act; modifying definitions; clarifying language. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Pharmacy Act; modifying definitions; clarifying language. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 43 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 43 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2015 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 31 |
2015-04-21 | House | General Order |
2015-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 353 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 11a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 13A | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 18A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 355 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 355 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |