OK SB784 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB784
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Vetoed 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Vetoed 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Board of Pharmacy; amending various sections. Effective date.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy; amending various sections. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vetoed 05/03/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 8 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Enns (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB784 (Carry Over) 2017-05-03 - Vetoed 05/03/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 353 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 353 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3601 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |