OK SB783 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Charter schools; providing for calculation of state aid for certain purpose.
Title
Charter schools; providing for calculation of state aid for certain purpose.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |