OK SB78 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oil and gas; authorizing the Corporation Commission to allow multiunit horizontal wells in certain targeted areas; requirements. Emergency.
Title
Oil and gas; authorizing the Corporation Commission to allow multiunit horizontal wells in certain targeted areas; requirements. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Energy and Aerospace Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Energy and Aerospace Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-20 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Aerospace |
2014-05-20 | Senate | SCs named Bingman, Branan, Marlatt, Johnson (Rob), Burrage, Ivester |
2014-05-15 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | House | General Order |
2013-04-03 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Aerospace Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Aerospace |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-21 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Trebilcock (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
52 | 87 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 87 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 87 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 87 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |