OK SB776 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Game and fish; modifying authority of the Wildlife Conservation Commission relating to the acquisition of certain property. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; modifying authority of the Wildlife Conservation Commission relating to the acquisition of certain property. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2021-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Hamilton
2021-02-25SenateCoauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
2021-02-22SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb776&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB776%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB776%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB776%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB776%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB776%20CA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB776%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB776%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB776%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB776_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback