OK SB772 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Driver licenses or identification cards; adding a certain form of proof of service for a certain designation. Effective date.
Title
Driver licenses or identification cards; adding a certain form of proof of service for a certain designation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | General Order |
2013-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ivester |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |