OK SB772 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Business and Professional License Facilitation Task Force; study of governmental models. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business and Professional License Facilitation Task Force; study of governmental models. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-19 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-19 To Senate
2011-05-19 Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 20; Ayes: 61 Nays: 35
2011-05-19 CCR adopted
2011-05-18 CCR submitted
2011-05-18 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2011-05-18 CCR adopted, GCCA
2011-05-17 Emergency added
2011-05-17 CCR read, GCCA
2011-05-09 SCs named GCCA
2011-05-09 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2011-05-04 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-04-27 HAs read
2011-04-27 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-26 Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 27; Ayes: 47 Nays: 27
2011-04-26 General Order
2011-04-14 Title restored
2011-04-14 Remove Representative Shannon as principal House author and substitute with Representative Murphey
2011-04-14 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2011-03-21 Referred to Government Modernization Committee
2011-03-21 Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
2011-03-17 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2011-03-16 First Reading
2011-03-16 Engrossed to House
2011-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-15 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2011-03-15 General Order, Amended
2011-03-07 Title stricken
2011-03-07 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2011-02-28 Referred to Appropriations
2011-02-28 coauthored by Shannon (principal House author)
2011-02-28 Title stricken
2011-02-28 Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2011-02-28 Senate Rule suspended
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Jolley
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
623411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74500315New CodeSee Bill Text
7450033New CodeSee Bill Text
745009AAmended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback