OK SB770 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB770
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; expanding schedules to include certain substances. Emergency.
Title
Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; expanding schedules to include certain substances. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Motion expired |
2017-05-23 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2017-05-23 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Stone |
2017-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2017-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Standridge, Yen, Griffin, McCortney, David, Matthews, Pittman |
2017-04-24 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | Emergency added |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2017-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Kannady (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB770 (Carry Over) 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 206 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |