OK SB765 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB765
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Practice of pharmacy; requiring wholesale distributors to provide for return of certain outdated prescription drugs; requiring prompt full credit to purchaser. Effective date.
Title
Practice of pharmacy; requiring wholesale distributors to provide for return of certain outdated prescription drugs; requiring prompt full credit to purchaser. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB765 (Carry Over) 2023-03-06 - Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)