OK SB755 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Treatment advocates; authorizing access to certain information by treatment advocates. Effective date.
Title
Treatment advocates; authorizing access to certain information by treatment advocates. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-17 | House | Amendment restores bill to engrossed version |
2013-04-17 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2013-04-17 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-17 | House | Amended |
2013-04-17 | House | House Rule suspended |
2013-04-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2013-04-17 | House | General Order |
2013-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-09 | House | Title stricken |
2013-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Health Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Sherrer (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ivester |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |