OK SB753 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma State Capitol Centennial Act; creating Oklahoma Capitol Centennial Rehabilitation and Modernization Commission. Codification. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma State Capitol Centennial Act; creating Oklahoma Capitol Centennial Rehabilitation and Modernization Commission. Codification. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Title restored | |
2011-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Liebmann (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
73 | 100 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 100 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 100 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |