OK SB752 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Health Care Authority; directing Authority to initiate certain procedures. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Health Care Authority; directing Authority to initiate certain procedures. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30HouseCR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2015-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
2015-03-10SenateTitle restored
2015-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2015-02-24Senatecoauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
2015-02-11SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
2015-02-04SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
2015-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator David
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback