OK SB737 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB737
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; modifying duties and prohibited acts of pharmacy benefit managers; authorizing Insurance Commissioner to take action on certain licenses. Emergency.
Title
Health insurance; modifying duties and prohibited acts of pharmacy benefit managers; authorizing Insurance Commissioner to take action on certain licenses. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Randleman |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-18 | House | To Senate |
2022-04-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-18 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Taylor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2021-05-06 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2021-05-04 | Senate | SCs named McCortney, Rosino, Daniels, Simpson, Hicks, Dossett (J.A.) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2021-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips |
2021-04-19 | House | General Order |
2021-04-07 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2021-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB737 (Carry Over) 2021-05-20 - Enacting clause restored