OK SB737 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB737
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Died in conference |
2017-05-15 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Sykes, Dahm, Holt, David, Newhouse, Floyd, Sparks |
2017-05-10 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB737 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Died in conference