OK SB735 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB735
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credit; providing credit for purchase of safe wheel tethering system. Effective date.
Title
Income tax credit; providing credit for purchase of safe wheel tethering system. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2022-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 12 |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-14 | House | Title stricken |
2022-04-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 11 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Howard |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB735 (Carry Over) 2021-03-30 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee