OK SB726 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic violence; authorizing creation of certain pilot programs. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence; authorizing creation of certain pilot programs. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-21SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-20SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2015-05-20SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-20Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2015-05-19SenateCCR read
2015-05-04HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2015-04-28SenateSCs named Crain, Sykes, Jolley, Treat, Schulz, Floyd, Sparks
2015-04-14SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-08SenateHAs read
2015-04-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 33
2015-04-07HouseAmended
2015-04-07HouseGeneral Order
2015-03-26HouseTitle restored
2015-03-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie)
2015-03-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2015-03-17HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee sub-committee
2015-03-11HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
2015-03-11HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2015-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2015-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2015-02-18Senatecoauthored by O'Donnell (principal House author)
2015-02-17SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-02-17SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Crain
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
226030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
226031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb726&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB726%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB726%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB726%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB726%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB726%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB726%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB726%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB726%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB726_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB726_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback