OK SB725 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Emergency restored
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Vaccinations; requiring school districts to report vaccine exemption information to Department of Health. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vaccinations; requiring school districts to report vaccine exemption information to Department of Health. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseEmergency restored
2017-04-11HouseTitle restored
2017-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 13
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-02-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Caldwell (principal House author)
2017-02-13SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-02-13SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-13SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Griffin
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210192New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback