OK SB723 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion; prohibiting abortion upon detection of fetal heartbeat; prohibiting issuance or renewal of physician license for certain acts. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; prohibiting abortion upon detection of fetal heartbeat; prohibiting issuance or renewal of physician license for certain acts. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2021-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9
2021-03-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Taylor
2021-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Rogers
2021-03-01Senatecoauthored by Gann
2021-02-23SenateCoauthored by Representative Olsen (principal House author)
2021-02-22SenateTitle stricken
2021-02-22SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2021-02-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback