OK SB721 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Bail bondsmen; modifying authority to provide certain education; requiring education provider submit certain fee. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail bondsmen; modifying authority to provide certain education; requiring education provider submit certain fee. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by Governor 04/30/2019
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-02-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
2019-02-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback