OK SB721 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax exemption for payments resulting from death in military action; creating opportunity for income tax refund donation through the Folds of Honor Scholarship Program. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax exemption for payments resulting from death in military action; creating opportunity for income tax refund donation through the Folds of Honor Scholarship Program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Randy Bass [D] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Eric Proctor [D] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] | Sen. Steve Russell [R] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-22 - House - House: S THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-13 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-13 | coauthored by Russell | |
2009-05-13 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-23 | HAs read | |
2009-04-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-22 | Amended | |
2009-04-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Proctor, Tibbs, Faught | |
2009-04-22 | General Order | |
2009-04-13 | Title restored | |
2009-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2009-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-09 | coauthored by Garrison, Bass | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Banz | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2358 | 1A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |