OK SB718 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB718
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Children's Code; including new definition. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Children's Code; including new definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB718 (Carry Over) 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |