OK SB716 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Beekeepers; exempting certain beekeepers from regulation and inspection by Health Department. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Beekeepers; exempting certain beekeepers from regulation and inspection by Health Department. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Donnie Condit [D] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/10/2013 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Pittman |
2013-04-03 | House | General Order |
2013-03-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2013-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Billy |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Condit (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 1330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |