OK SB712 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB712
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying qualifiers that provide for revocation of driver licenses. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying qualifiers that provide for revocation of driver licenses. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended |
2019-04-23 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB712 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019