OK SB711 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substance abuse services; requiring Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to provide emergency opioid antagonists and education; requiring Department of Corrections and county jails to provide emergency opioid antagonists to certain persons subject to certain condition. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance abuse services; requiring Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to provide emergency opioid antagonists and education; requiring Department of Corrections and county jails to provide emergency opioid antagonists to certain persons subject to certain condition. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITHOUT EMER (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: certain (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2023-05-26HouseTo Senate
2023-05-26HouseVeto overridden: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0
2023-05-25HouseVeto override message received
2023-05-25SenateMeasure sent to House
2023-05-25SenateVeto overridden: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
2023-04-26SenateVetoed 04/26/2023
2023-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2023-04-19SenateReferred for enrollment
2023-04-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-19HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2023-04-19HouseGeneral Order
2023-04-06HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2023-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2023-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2023-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2023-03-08SenateTitle restored
2023-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2023-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2023-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2023-02-23SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-02-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2023-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Rosino
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb711&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB711%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB711%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB711%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB711%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB711%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/SB/SB711%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB711%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB711%20(3-06-23)%20(ROSINO)%20RT%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB711%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB711%20CS%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB711%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB711%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB711_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB711_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback