OK SB711 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Judiciary Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Judiciary Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Transportation; authorizing ODOT to assume certain federal environmental duties. Codification. Emergency.
Title
Transportation; authorizing ODOT to assume certain federal environmental duties. Codification. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-04-12 | Title restored | |
2011-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-16 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by Richardson (principal House author) | |
2011-02-15 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |