OK SB706 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; relating to evaluation policies; implementation of the Teacher and Leader Effectiveness Evaluation System. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Teachers; relating to evaluation policies; implementation of the Teacher and Leader Effectiveness Evaluation System. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ford [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/03/2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-21 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2015-05-19 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-05-19 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2015-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2015-04-29 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2015-04-27 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-22 | House | Amended |
2015-04-22 | House | General Order |
2015-03-24 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Casey (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |