OK SB698 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; requiring Board of Directors of Health Insurance High Risk Pool to provide written plan for continued operation; providing for approval and legislative review. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; requiring Board of Directors of Health Insurance High Risk Pool to provide written plan for continued operation; providing for approval and legislative review. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Motion expired |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote tabled |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Brown |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 21 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Insurance |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |