OK SB696 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB696
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Children; modifying various provisions relating to Oklahoma Commission on Children and Youth and postadjudication review boards. Emergency.
Title
Children; modifying various provisions relating to Oklahoma Commission on Children and Youth and postadjudication review boards. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2023-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB696 (Carry Over) 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee